MN HF502 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
DWI offenders not required to take a specified examination as a condition of driver's license reinstatement.
Title
DWI offenders not required to take a specified examination as a condition of driver's license reinstatement.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] |
Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Cedrick Frazier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Frazier |
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Poston |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Koznick |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF895 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Author added Johnson