MN HF574 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Poston.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Poston.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Refundable credit for attaining a master's degree in a teacher's licensure field provided.
Title
Refundable credit for attaining a master's degree in a teacher's licensure field provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] |
Rep. Regina Barr [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Author added Poston. |
2017-03-07 | House | Author added Barr, R. |
2017-02-15 | House | Authors added Moran and Pugh. |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF524 (Similar To) 2017-03-06 - Author added Franzen