MN HF58 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Pursell
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Pursell
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dismissal of students in kindergarten through grade 3 prohibited, and money appropriated.
Title
Dismissal of students in kindergarten through grade 3 prohibited, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Author added Pursell |
2023-02-01 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2023-01-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance |
2023-01-19 | House | Author added Lee, K. |
2023-01-17 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-01-11 | House | Authors added Hicks; Agbaje |
2023-01-09 | House | Authors added Xiong, Vang, Noor, and Youakim |
2023-01-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF69 (Similar To) 2023-01-09 - Referred to Education Finance