MN HF581 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle titles and disclosure governing requirements technical change made.
Title
Motor vehicle titles and disclosure governing requirements technical change made.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders SF624 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF624, now on General Orders |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-03-27 | House | Bill was passed |
2023-03-27 | House | Third reading |
2023-03-23 | House | House rule 1.23, placed on Consent Calendar Monday, March 27, 2023 |
2023-01-30 | House | Second reading |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF624 (Similar To) 2023-04-03 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF581, SF indefinitely postponed