MN HF613 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Wolgamott
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Wolgamott
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Human trafficking offense penalties increased, prostitute patron penalties increased, and trespassing offense penalties increased.
Title
Human trafficking offense penalties increased, prostitute patron penalties increased, and trespassing offense penalties increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Heather Keeler [D] |
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Theis |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Huot |
2021-02-04 | House | Authors added Miller, Edelson, and Keeler |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF765 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Author added Pappas