MN HF652 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Life insurers prohibited from using opiate antagonist prescription when making life insurance policy determinations.
Title
Life insurers prohibited from using opiate antagonist prescription when making life insurance policy determinations.
Sponsors
Rep. Erin Koegel [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Secretary of State Chapter 10 | |
2021-03-26 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-03-26 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-03-26 | Governor approval | |
2021-03-25 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF837 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF837, now on General Orders |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-03-18 | House | Bill was passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Third reading |
2021-03-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 18, 2021 |
2021-02-15 | House | Second reading |
2021-02-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF837 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF652