MN HF712 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Author added Hortman.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Author added Hortman.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
General education basic formula allowance increased, and annual inflationary increases provided in the basic formula allowance for fiscal year 2018 and later.
Title
General education basic formula allowance increased, and annual inflationary increases provided in the basic formula allowance for fiscal year 2018 and later.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. Ron Erhardt [D] |
Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Melissa Hortman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Author added Hortman. |
2015-02-12 | House | Authors added Erhardt and Ward. |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF541 (Similar To) 2015-02-05 - Referred to Finance