MN HF790 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 96
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 96
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Conditional release terms clarified.
Title
Conditional release terms clarified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 96 | |
2013-05-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-05-17 | House | Returned from Senate |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 52-0 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF668 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF668, now on General Orders |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-04-25 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 131-0 |
2013-04-25 | House | Third reading as amended |
2013-04-25 | House | Amended |
2013-04-23 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 17, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2013-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |