MN HF790 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Author added Ecklund
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Author added Ecklund
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Second Harvest Heartland previous appropriation modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Second Harvest Heartland previous appropriation modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Hanson [D] | Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. Emma Greenman [D] | Rep. Heather Keeler [D] |
Rep. John Thompson [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2021-02-08 | House | Author added Sundin |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1503 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Author added Anderson