MN HF8 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unified personal health premium accounts permitted.
Title
Unified personal health premium accounts permitted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-28 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference Committee (Y: 69 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Amendment, as amended (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Amendment to Amendment (Y: 72 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Amendment (Y: 60 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-28 - House - Amendment (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Amendment, as amended (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Amendment to Amendment (Y: 72 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Amendment (Y: 60 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-28 - House - Amendment (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 276 | |
2012-04-30 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-04-28 | Senate | Third reading vote: 34-28 |
2012-04-28 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-04-28 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-28 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 34-28 |
2012-04-28 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 69-60 |
2012-04-28 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2012-04-28 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2012-04-28 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-04-27 | Senate | House conferee change Gruenhagen replaces Mack |
2012-04-27 | House | House conferee change delete Mack, add Gruenhagen |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate conferees Hann; Benson; Newman |
2012-04-26 | House | Senate conferees Hann, Benson, Newman |
2012-04-26 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2011-05-11 | House | House conferees Gottwalt, Abeler, and Mack |
2011-05-11 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2011-05-11 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2011-05-11 | Senate | House conferees Gottwalt; Abeler; Mack |
2011-05-11 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 37-28 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Special Order |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF32 |
2011-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2011-05-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2011-05-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2011-04-28 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 70-62 |
2011-04-28 | House | Third reading as amended |
2011-04-28 | House | Amended |
2011-04-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-04-06 | House | Second reading |
2011-04-06 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2011-02-28 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2011-02-07 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2011-01-20 | House | Authors added Kelly and Schomacker |
2011-01-20 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
2011-01-18 | House | Authors added Shimanski and Crawford |
2011-01-13 | House | Authors added Kiffmeyer; Mack; Murdock; Drazkowski; Urdahl; Anderson, P.; McFarlane; Nornes; Dettmer; Gruenhagen; Bills; Scott; Torkelson; Banaian; Downey; Vogel and Fabian |
2011-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |