MN HF82 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Author added Atkins.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Author added Atkins.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Estate tax conformed to federal exclusion amount.
Title
Estate tax conformed to federal exclusion amount.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | House | Author added Atkins. |
2015-01-22 | House | Authors added Pugh and Lien. |
2015-01-15 | House | Author added Dill. |
2015-01-14 | House | Authors added Petersburg, Uglem, and Rosenthal. |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF198 (Similar To) 2015-01-20 - Referred to Taxes