MN HF88 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Author added Runbeck
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Author added Runbeck
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Courts required to transfer records of stays of adjudication to the Bureau of Criminal Apprehension, Bureau of Criminal Apprehension required to share stays of adjudication data with parties requesting background checks, and offenders who receive stays of adjudication for disqualifying offenses prohibited from serving as school bus drivers.
Title
Courts required to transfer records of stays of adjudication to the Bureau of Criminal Apprehension, Bureau of Criminal Apprehension required to share stays of adjudication data with parties requesting background checks, and offenders who receive stays of adjudication for disqualifying offenses prohibited from serving as school bus drivers.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Sen. Steve Green [R] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Runbeck |
2019-01-22 | House | Authors added Theis and Dettmer |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF837 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Chief author added Utke