MN HF882 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-19 - Author added Bly.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-19 - Author added Bly.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State forecast required to include rate of inflation.
Title
State forecast required to include rate of inflation.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] | Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] |
Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Author added Bly. |
2015-02-18 | House | Authors added Lien and Schultz. |
2015-02-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF667 (Similar To) 2015-02-09 - Referred to Finance