MN HF898 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - Authors added Murphy, E., and Moran.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - Authors added Murphy, E., and Moran.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Parenting with a disability support services pilot project established, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Parenting with a disability support services pilot project established, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] |
Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | House | Authors added Murphy, E., and Moran. |
2017-03-02 | House | Author added Maye Quade. |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2017-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF846 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy