MN HF909 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Mann
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Mann
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prenatal care service programs and funding governed, and money appropriated.
Title
Prenatal care service programs and funding governed, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Carlie Kotyza-Witthuhn [D] |
Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] |
Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] |
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] |
Sen. Alice Mann [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Author added Mann |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Lippert |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-03-18 | House | Author stricken Heintzeman |
2019-03-07 | House | Author stricken McDonald |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-25 | House | Authors added Poppe and Long |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Backer, Acomb, Hansen, Nornes, Her, Hamilton, McDonald, Hassan, and Xiong, J. |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF855 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy