MN HF91 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Complaints against peace officers data collection and analysis process created, peace officer discipline report provided, Board of Peace Officer Standards and Training membership expanded, Police-Community Relations Council established to report and advice Peace Officer Standards and Training Board, and money appropriated.
Title
Complaints against peace officers data collection and analysis process created, peace officer discipline report provided, Board of Peace Officer Standards and Training membership expanded, Police-Community Relations Council established to report and advice Peace Officer Standards and Training Board, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2020-06-18 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2020-06-16 | House | Author added Noor |
2020-06-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |