MN HF938 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Reyer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Reyer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child blood lead level reduction goal established, and commissioner of health annual public report issuance required.
Title
Child blood lead level reduction goal established, and commissioner of health annual public report issuance required.
Sponsors
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Laurie Pryor [D] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Author added Reyer |
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Fischer |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Hassan, Pryor |
2021-03-03 | House | Division action, return to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventive Health Policy Division |
2021-02-11 | House | Author added Jordan |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1299 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy