MN HF953 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-09 - House: Author stricken Rosenthal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-09 - House: Author stricken Rosenthal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer of pistols or semiautomatic military-style assault weapons provisions modified.
Title
Transfer of pistols or semiautomatic military-style assault weapons provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-09 | House: Author stricken Rosenthal | |
2009-03-02 | House: Author added Mariani | |
2009-02-26 | House: Author added Hausman | |
2009-02-25 | House: Referred by Chair to Crime Victims/Criminal Records Division | |
2009-02-23 | House: Author added Slocum | |
2009-02-19 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Policy and Oversight |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF0953&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF0953.0.pdf |