MN HF973 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Pollution Control Agency Citizens Board reinstated.
Title
Minnesota Pollution Control Agency Citizens Board reinstated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Jordan |
2019-05-17 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2019-04-08 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Fischer |
2019-03-21 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Hansen |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF627 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance