MN HF999 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Authors added Freiberg, Edelson, Greenman, Howard and Lee
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Authors added Freiberg, Edelson, Greenman, Howard and Lee
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Covenants not to compete provided as void and unenforceable, and protection of substantive provisions of law to apply to matters provided.
Title
Covenants not to compete provided as void and unenforceable, and protection of substantive provisions of law to apply to matters provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
Rep. Emma Greenman [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Authors added Freiberg, Edelson, Greenman, Howard and Lee |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2022-02-01 | House | Author added Long |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1629 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Labor and Industry Policy