MN SC8 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Returned from House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Returned from House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate concurrent resolution relating to adjournment of the Senate and House of Representatives until 2012
Title
A Senate concurrent resolution relating to adjournment of the Senate and House of Representatives until 2012
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Koch [R] | Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Senate | Returned from House |
2011-05-22 | House | Resolution was adopted |
2011-05-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2011-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2011-05-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Adopted (voice vote) |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Introduction |