MN SF1 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - HF substituted on General Orders HF5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - HF substituted on General Orders HF5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Minnesota Insurance Marketplace Act (MNsure)
Title
Minnesota Insurance Marketplace Act (MNsure)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF5 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |