MN SF1 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health coverage, claim denial review, college student services, voice response suicide prevention, crisis connection, officer-involved community-based care, tribes inclusion, school-linked and shelter-linked programs requirements and grants; community competency restoration task force; appropriations
Title
Mental health coverage, claim denial review, college student services, voice response suicide prevention, crisis connection, officer-involved community-based care, tribes inclusion, school-linked and shelter-linked programs requirements and grants; community competency restoration task force; appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Paul T. Anderson [R] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authors added Nelson; Hoffman |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2726 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division