MN SF1059 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF859
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF859
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unused or divided lands owned or controlled by the department of transportation (DOT) conveyance authorization; trunk highway system highways removal and modification authorization; Koochiching county state owned lands conveyance authorization
Title
Unused or divided lands owned or controlled by the department of transportation (DOT) conveyance authorization; trunk highway system highways removal and modification authorization; Koochiching county state owned lands conveyance authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF859 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF859 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Senate conferees Newman, Jasinski, Kiffmeyer, Ozmek, Sparks