MN SF1132 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Electric vehicle infrastructure program authorization
Title
Electric vehicle infrastructure program authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1346 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Second reading