MN SF1164 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health and human services background study consideration of juvenile court records; disqualification periods modification; set aside for disqualification based on conduct or convictions in an individuals court record allowance
Title
Health and human services background study consideration of juvenile court records; disqualification periods modification; set aside for disqualification based on conduct or convictions in an individuals court record allowance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1172 (Similar To) 2023-03-16 - Author added Zeleznikar