MN SF1173 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Jobs and Economic Development
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Jobs and Economic Development
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community energy transition grant program modification and appropriation
Title
Community energy transition grant program modification and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Grant Hauschild [D] | Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] | Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] |
Sen. Nick Frentz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Jobs and Economic Development |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Development |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1398 (Similar To) 2023-03-06 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy