MN SF1197 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Verdicts, awards and judgements Interest regulation
Title
Verdicts, awards and judgements Interest regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Johnson [R] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Dan Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Author stricken Sparks |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Author stricken Wiger |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1281 (Similar To) 2017-02-27 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance