MN SF1199 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Author added Ortman
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Author added Ortman
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care assistance program provider reimbursement rates increase and appropriation
Title
Child care assistance program provider reimbursement rates increase and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] | Sen. James Carlson [D] |
Sen. Julianne Ortman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Author added Ortman |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1057 (Similar To) 2015-03-18 - Author added Allen.