MN SF1276 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Senate: HF substituted by motion HF1309
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Senate: HF substituted by motion HF1309
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus transportation, metropolitan council and public safety activities and programs appropriations
Title
Omnibus transportation, metropolitan council and public safety activities and programs appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. James Carlson [D] | Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Michael Jungbauer [R] | Sen. Steven Murphy [D] |
Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Senate: HF substituted by motion HF1309 | |
2009-04-23 | Senate: Laid on table | |
2009-04-23 | Senate: Third reading Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Senate: Special Order: Amended | |
2009-04-22 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-04-22 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-04-21 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes | |
2009-03-09 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-03-09 | Senate: Referred to Finance |