MN SF1304 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative budget office creation
Title
Legislative budget office creation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to State and Local Government |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Author added Benson |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1281 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance