MN SF1332 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Civil remedies for consumer protection violations authorization
Title
Civil remedies for consumer protection violations authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Bonnie Westlin [D] |
Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1459 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Second reading