MN SF137 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-18 - Senate: General Orders: Stricken and returned to author
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-18 - Senate: General Orders: Stricken and returned to author
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adoption records and original birth certificates access provisions modifications
Title
Adoption records and original birth certificates access provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Berglin [D] | Sen. Sharon Erickson Ropes [D] | Sen. Gen Olson [R] | Rep. Mark Olson [R] |
Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Senate: General Orders: Stricken and returned to author | |
2009-03-19 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-03-19 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-02-05 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2009-01-26 | Senate: Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary | |
2009-01-22 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-01-22 | Senate: Referred to Health, Housing and Family Security |