MN SF1379 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health quarantines employee protections modification
Title
Public health quarantines employee protections modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1675 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform