MN SF1423 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Manufactured homes affixed to cooperative or non-profit owned real property consideration as an improvement to real property
Title
Manufactured homes affixed to cooperative or non-profit owned real property consideration as an improvement to real property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Authors added Goggin; Kunesh |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF896 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Author added Hamilton