MN SF1458 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus health and human services appropriations bill
Title
Omnibus health and human services appropriations bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 99 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 86 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House: Passage (Y: 72 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 0 N: 133 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 76 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 76 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Re-Referral (Y: 62 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 23 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 99 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 86 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House: Passage (Y: 72 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 0 N: 133 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 76 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 76 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Re-Referral (Y: 62 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 23 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2015-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2015-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 71 | |
2015-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2015-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2015-05-18 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2015-05-17 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 99-31 |
2015-05-17 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2015-05-17 | House | House adopted conference committee report vote: 86-43 |
2015-05-17 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2015-05-17 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 49-16 |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Third reading vote: 49-16 |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2015-04-30 | Senate | House conferees Dean, M.; Mack; Schomacker; McDonald; Zerwas |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate conferees Lourey; Sheran; Hayden; Franzen; Rosen |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2015-04-29 | House | House conferees Dean, M; Mack; Schomacker; McDonald; and Zerwas. |
2015-04-29 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2015-04-29 | House | Senate conferees Lourey; Sheran; Hayden; Franzen; Rosen |
2015-04-29 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2015-04-28 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 72-60 |
2015-04-28 | House | House rule 2.05, member excused from voting Thissen was not excused from voting |
2015-04-28 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 59-73 |
2015-04-28 | House | Motion for reconsideration Third reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Third reading as amended |
2015-04-28 | House | Point of order raised multiple points of order |
2015-04-28 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 62-72 |
2015-04-28 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2015-04-28 | House | Amended |
2015-04-25 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 28, 2015 |
2015-04-25 | House | Second reading |
2015-04-25 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-04-24 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1638 |
2015-04-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 38-22 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1638 (Similar To) 2015-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed