MN SF1480 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - Author stricken Senjem
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - Author stricken Senjem
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ka Joog job skills and workforce development pilot program appropriation for Somali youth; Takeoff 4-H STEAM for Somali youth grant expansion appropriation
Title
Ka Joog job skills and workforce development pilot program appropriation for Somali youth; Takeoff 4-H STEAM for Somali youth grant expansion appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Author stricken Senjem |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1515 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Author added Theis as chief author.