MN SF1499 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 19 05/07/15
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 19 05/07/15
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cedar Lake area water and sanitary sewer district filing deadline extension
Title
Cedar Lake area water and sanitary sewer district filing deadline extension
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Dahle [D] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Secretary of State Chapter 19 05/07/15 | |
2015-05-08 | Governor's action Approval 05/07/15 | |
2015-05-07 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2015-05-07 | Governor approval | |
2015-05-06 | Presented to Governor | |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Returned from House |
2015-05-05 | House | Bill was passed vote: 129-0 |
2015-05-05 | House | Third reading |
2015-05-01 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 5, 2015 |
2015-04-30 | House | Second reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-04-29 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1541 |
2015-04-29 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 62-1 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1541 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - HF indefinitely postponed