MN SF153 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF85
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF85
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medical services regulatory board guidelines for patient-assisted medication administration in EMT emergencies
Title
Emergency medical services regulatory board guidelines for patient-assisted medication administration in EMT emergencies
Sponsors
Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] | Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. Scott Jensen [R] | Sen. Nick Frentz [D] |
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF85 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF564 (Similar To) 2019-02-04 - Author added Demuth
HF85 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 25 05/15/2019
HF85 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 25 05/15/2019