MN SF1545 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Food safety and defense task force extension; animal definition modification
Title
Food safety and defense task force extension; animal definition modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1545 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1545 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 88