MN SF1563 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1732
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1732
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance examinations regulation provisions modification
Title
Insurance examinations regulation provisions modification
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] | Sen. Bobby Champion [D] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1732 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Author added Bakk |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1732 (Similar To) 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 39 05/11/17