MN SF1590 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-20 - Author added Abeler
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-20 - Author added Abeler
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
African American Child Wellness Institute grant appropriation
Title
African American Child Wellness Institute grant appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Author added Boldon |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1633 (Similar To) 2023-03-09 - Author added Fischer