MN SF1689 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 192 04/18/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 192 04/18/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans waiver of immunity to sue state for Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act (USERRA) violations; veteran-owned small businesses set aside program modification; veterans reemployment rights protections extension
Title
Veterans waiver of immunity to sue state for Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act (USERRA) violations; veteran-owned small businesses set aside program modification; veterans reemployment rights protections extension
Sponsors
Sen. Al DeKruif [R] | Sen. Theodore Daley [R] | Sen. Mike Parry [R] | Sen. Roger Reinert [D] |
Sen. Charles Wiger [D] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - House - Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 192 04/18/12 | |
2012-04-20 | Governor's action Approval 04/18/12 | |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Returned from House |
2012-04-16 | House | Bill was passed vote: 129-0 |
2012-04-16 | House | Third reading |
2012-04-02 | House | Second reading |
2012-04-02 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-30 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1416 |
2012-03-30 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Comm report: Amend previous comm report Re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Jobs and Economic Growth |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Author added Wiger |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Referred to State Government Innovation and Veterans |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |