MN SF1761 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sandstone Wild River apartments development sale authorization
Title
Sandstone Wild River apartments development sale authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | House | Second reading |
2012-04-27 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2012-04-26 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2082 |
2012-04-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-0 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Local Government and Elections |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF1761&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=SF1761&version=0&session=ls87 |