MN SF18 | 2021 | 92nd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - HF passed, no substitution HF7
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - HF passed, no substitution HF7
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus higher education finance and policy
Title
Omnibus higher education finance and policy
Sponsors
Sen. David Tomassoni [I] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Sen. Mike Goggin [R] | Sen. John Jasinski [R] |
Sen. Greg Clausen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | HF passed, no substitution HF7 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Third reading |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF7 (Similar To) 2021-06-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 2