MN SF1940 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
World War I Minnesota veterans Capitol grounds plaque placement
Title
World War I Minnesota veterans Capitol grounds plaque placement
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Clausen [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF810 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Chief author added Clausen |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Chief author stricken Abeler |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF810 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 32 05/17/2019