MN SF1943 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign finance provisions modifications
Title
Campaign finance provisions modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Elections |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Elections |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2392 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Second reading