MN SF2127 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-23 - Author added Lillie
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-23 - Author added Lillie
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Minnesota Vikings national football league (NFL) private stadium bond issue and appropriation
Title
Minnesota Vikings national football league (NFL) private stadium bond issue and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] | Sen. David Hann [R] | Sen. Pam Wolf [R] | Sen. Dan Hall [R] |
Sen. Ted Lillie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Senate | Author added Lillie |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Author added Hall |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Local Government and Elections |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |