MN SF2144 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Author added Housley
Pending: Senate Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Author added Housley
Pending: Senate Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Solar for schools program establishment and public utility requirements
Title
Solar for schools program establishment and public utility requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Author added Housley |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Author added Rarick |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1427 (Similar To) 2021-04-09 - Author added Xiong, J.