MN SF2181 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 196 04/20/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 196 04/20/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Renewable development account regulation
Title
Renewable development account regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - House - Passage (Y: 85 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Oral Amendment (Y: 57 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - Oral Amendment (Y: 57 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Secretary of State Chapter 196 04/20/12 | |
2012-04-23 | Governor's action Approval 04/20/12 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Returned from House |
2012-04-17 | House | Bill was passed vote: 85-46 |
2012-04-17 | House | Third reading |
2012-04-17 | House | Amendments offered |
2012-04-16 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-30 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-30 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2012-03-29 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2650 |
2012-03-29 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |